PARKINSON'S DISEASE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 258197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Brian Durdy Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
Tim Tamblyn Trustee 07 September 2014 None on record
Dr Andrew Michael James Cavey Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
Elaine Evans Trustee 27 March 2020 None on record
Kyle McClean Alexander Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
PAUL THOMAS WARNER Trustee 14 October 2017 None on record
Gary Shaughnessy Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
MARGARET CHAMBERLAIN Trustee 18 September 2013
THE UNIV. OLD MEMBERS' TRUST Received: 23 days late
TARGET OVARIAN CANCER Received: On time
Paresh Thakrar Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
Katrina Green Trustee 27 April 2020 None on record
Helen Jane Burston Trustee 12 October 2019 None on record
Peter Edwin Miller Trustee 12 October 2019 None on record
David Alexander Allan Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record