Financial history ROYAL ENGINEERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 258322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.23m £1.21m £1.17m £1.16m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.87m £849.50k £1.43m £1.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £655.62k £606.78k £570.82k £570.24k £716.16k
Income - Other trading activities £146.51k £166.70k £162.47k £0 £22.57k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £21.02k £0 £138.05k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £401.90k £419.86k £422.24k £425.08k £430.79k
Income - Other £21.77k £0 £15.62k £22.06k £11.29k
Income - Legacies £59.01k £72.00k £36.59k £26.73k £125.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £1.87m £843.84k £1.43m £1.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.36k £3.79k £5.66k £3.05k £5.34k
Expenditure - Governance £226.19k £242.35k £20.90k £3.36k £134.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £68.00k £399.22k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0