Trustees ROYAL ENGINEERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 258322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maj Gen A S Dickinson CBE Chair 16 July 2015
ROYAL ENGINEERS CENTRAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Col retd Jonathan Mark Ruddy Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Warrant Officer Class One Marc Elliot MBE Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Colin Basnett CBE Trustee 30 August 2019
None on record
Jeffrey Jupp Trustee 27 August 2019
None on record
Lt Col Claire James RE Trustee 27 August 2019
None on record
Jane Thomson Trustee 16 July 2019
None on record
COL MATTHEW QUARE MBE ADC Trustee 15 September 2017
THE ROYAL ENGINEERS MUSEUM
Received: On time
ROYAL ENGINEERS CENTRAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL ENGINEERS VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING TRUST
Received: On time
LT COL MARTIN HEFFER Trustee 31 August 2016
None on record
Eric Hargreaves Trustee 31 August 2016
None on record
Lt Col Larry Inge Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
BRIGADIER ANDY CRAIG OBE Trustee
None on record