Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY OF PAINTERS IN WATER COLOURS

Charity number: 258348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £62.45k £226.53k £126.67k £200.30k £228.32k
Total expenditure £76.07k £121.41k £113.18k £118.11k £137.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A