Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY OF PAINTERS IN WATER COLOURS
Charity number: 258348

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL LEMAN RWS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lisa Traxler | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROF JAMES HUNTER | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Freemantle | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Hamilton | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lewis | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gertie Young | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Crossley ARWS | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Faure Walker ARWS | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK RAGGETT ARWS | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Francis Bowyer PPRWSHonRE | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS PLUNKETT PRWS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.