Financial history CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY RIFLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 258396
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £27.02k £21.70k £23.14k £15.09k £10.66k
Total expenditure £21.11k £25.39k £30.16k £15.74k £9.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A