Accounts and annual returns AGAPE MINISTRIES LTD

Charity number: 258421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window