Financial history BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF DERMATOLOGISTS

Charity number: 258474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.08m £5.39m £6.02m £4.16m £5.38m
Total expenditure £4.61m £4.88m £5.54m £3.93m £5.11m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £380.13k £365.23k £0 £297.48k £380.53k
Income - Charitable activities £6.69m £5.01m £6.00m £3.78m £4.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.30k £11.82k £21.62k £83.11k £81.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.61m £4.88m £5.54m £3.92m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £4.18k £6.76k
Expenditure - Governance £32.23k £20.30k £31.42k £28.46k £36.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £537.63k £331.28k £450.60k £388.98k £158.55k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0