MARCHESI CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Marchesi Centre is a community resource used by many of its member living in the area aged 50plus. Not solely for the over 50s the centre is used by the whole community. Trips and events are organised and enjoyed by many members and their guests, Various activities include, art, exercise, yoga, talks, dancing to name but a few
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 26 June 1969: Standard registration
- THE WINDERMERE OLD PEOPLE'S COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH RIMMER | Chair | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anita Baxter | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sisson | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pam Cunningham | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harrison | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY ANNE PEDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HELEN FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERTHA EDITH BIRKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.88k | £46.19k | £37.32k | £42.86k | £49.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.35k | £21.06k | £41.64k | £40.77k | £53.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | £11.33k | £16.34k | £2.67k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST JANUARY 1969 AS AMENDED 26 MARCH 1998 AND 28 MARCH 2000 as amended on 27 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
A) THE OBJECTIVE OF THE MARCHESI CENTRE IS TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE OVER 50 YEARS OF AGE LIVING WITHIN THE POSTCODE AREA LA23 WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS, AND B) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PERSONS OVER 50 LIVING WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
WINDERMERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLY ROAD
WINDERMERE
CUMBRIA
LA23 2AF
- Phone:
- 01539443411
- Email:
- MCWINDERMERE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
marchesicentre.wix.com/marchesi-centre
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window