Accounts and annual returns WEST INDIA COMMITTEE

Charity number: 258545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window