WEST INDIA COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The West India Committee exists as a venerable UK charity whose object is to promote the interests of agriculture, manufacturing industries and trade of the West Indies, Belize and Guyana and thus increase the general welfare of those territories [and their people globally] [delivering] through education, training, acting as an advocate, adviser and where necessary, as an umbrella organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Aruba
- Barbados
- Belize
- Bermuda
- British Virgin Islands
- Cayman Islands
- Cuba
- Dominica
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guyana
- Jamaica
- Martinique
- Montserrat
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Vincent
- Sint Maarten
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Suriname
- The Bahamas
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turks And Caicos Islands
Governance
- 07 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Forde KC | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Victor Franklin Banks | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sir Rodney Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Beckingham | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER JULIAN ODLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £328.08k | £228.35k | £149.83k | £216.03k | £60.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.18k | £222.25k | £253.30k | £199.43k | £122.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £44.58k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH AUGUST 1904 AND RULES ADOPTED 29TH NOVEMBER 1948 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1972 AND AMENDED 26TH AUGUST 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE INTEREST OF THE AGRICULTURAL AND MANUFACTURING INDUSTRIES AND TRADE OF THE WEST INDIES, GUYANA AND BRITISH HONDURAS AND THUS TO INCREASE THE GENERAL WELFARE OF THOSE TERRITORIES.
Area of benefit
THE WEST INDIES GUYANA AND BRITISH HONDURAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Remembrance Trust
Lord Warden House
Lord Warden Square
DOVER
Kent
CT17 9EQ
- Phone:
- 01304 448900
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window