THE BURTONS' ST LEONARDS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 258719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 May 2017 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required