ALLIANCE FAMILY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 258721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £700.23k £3.69m £5.68m £531.69k £1.33m
Total expenditure £1.04m £726.06k £517.76k £635.73k £361.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £578 £3.00m £5.00m £0 £1.00m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £699.65k £686.32k £676.53k £531.69k £331.74k
Income - Other £0 £6.57k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £963.90k £628.79k £510.98k £582.78k £297.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £74.74k £97.27k £6.78k £52.95k £63.64k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £409.34k £158.02k £143.20k £348.64k £86.26k
Expenditure - Investment management £74.74k £97.27k £0 £2.97k £7.32k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0