Financial history EXPERIMENTAL PSYCHOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity number: 258747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £461.94k £350.38k £594.24k £492.87k £423.75k
Total expenditure £366.12k £365.88k £287.15k £292.78k £338.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £10.15k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £576.37k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £7.71k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £287.15k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A