Financial history THE R H HOBHOUSE FUND

Charity number: 258826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £767 £727 £739 £690 £606
Total expenditure £683 £801 £1.05k £750 £445
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A