Accounts and annual returns THE EVANGELICAL TIMES LIMITED

Charity number: 258927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 07 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window