OXFORDSHIRE ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and to promote research into and study of archaeology, architecture and history and kindred subjects, especially in their relation to one another; to make available to the public the results of such research through lecture meetings and an annual journal, Oxoniensia, containing papers and articles and other items of local archaeological or historical interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 19 August 1969: Standard registration
- OAHS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Geoffrey Tyack | Chair | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR BOB CRABTREE | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL HIND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.32k | £36.56k | £30.95k | £36.59k | £52.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.35k | £26.08k | £22.03k | £27.56k | £31.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED ON THE 4TH JUNE 1969 AND LETTER DATED THE 23RD NOVEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE STUDY OF ARCHAEOLOGY, ARCHITECTURE AND HISTORY, AND KINDRED SUBJECTS, ESPECIALLY IN THEIR RELATION TO ONE ANOTHER, AND TO MAKE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Victoria Road
OXFORD
OX2 7QD
- Phone:
- 07884436514
- Email:
- treasurer@oahs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window