THE CAMBRIAN COAST EVANGELICAL TRUST

Charity number: 259100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 20 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 02 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 02 February 2017 On time Download