Accounts and annual returns YEOMANRY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 259125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 16 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 16 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 17 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window