Trustees YEOMANRY BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 259125

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CW ELWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Sean Costello TD | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Alexandra Gail Milne MBE | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alexander John Mallin | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Keith James Durward | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Colonel Oliver John Harben Chamberlain QVRM TD DL | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
RUTHVEN AUSTEN BURDON-COOPER | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
The LORD Rupert Charles DE MAULEY TD | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|||||||
Brigadier HUGH JOHN ROBERTSON QVRM TD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.