Trustees DORSET HORN AND POLL DORSET SHEEP BREEDERS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 259199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERAINT JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christina Johnson | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Morton | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joe Dufosee | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Caldwell | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Robson | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Llewellyn John Care | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sian Rebecca Downes | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy William Lawson Pratt | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Larder | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sam Driver | Trustee | 25 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Graham Cubitt | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM FREDERICK CARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCIS CLIFFORD FOOKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROWLAND DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MARTIN HOLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.