THE CHARITY OF RICHARD JOYNES EMMERSON

Charity number: 259283
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4480 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Overdue Overdue by 4480 days
Annual return 31 March 2007 Overdue Overdue by 4846 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Overdue Overdue by 4846 days
Annual return 31 March 2006 Overdue Overdue by 5211 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Overdue Overdue by 5211 days
Annual return 31 March 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5576 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Overdue Overdue by 5576 days
Annual return 31 March 2004 Overdue Overdue by 5941 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Overdue Overdue by 5941 days