Accounts and annual returns THE WYNDHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 259313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 June 2022 05 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2022 05 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 June 2021 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2021 17 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 June 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2020 16 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 June 2019 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2019 13 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 June 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2018 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window