Financial history THE WYNDHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 259313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/06/2018 20/06/2019 20/06/2020 20/06/2021 20/06/2022
Total gross income £82.32k £194.88k £199.56k £133.32k £234.90k
Total expenditure £78.41k £87.06k £83.86k £83.78k £102.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A