ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE CHAPELS ROYAL WITHIN HER MAJESTY'S TOWER OF LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of public religious services and other facilities for public worship at the two Chapels Royal within Her Majesty's Tower of London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 September 1969: Standard registration
- 03 March 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1160859 THE HM TOWER OF LONDON CHAPELS ROYAL FOUNDATION
- THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE CHAPELS OF H M TOWER, LONDON (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.45k | £8.40k | £8.78k | £7.07k | £6.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.71k | £7.87k | £7.88k | £15.76k | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 17 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 09 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 03 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST AUGUST 1969 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 24TH JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PUBLIC RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AT THE CHAPEL ROYAL OF ST PETER AD VINCULA AND THE CHAPEL OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST H.M. TOWER
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window