BELL STREET MISSION ROOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting St John's Church Common Fund and St Michael's Rector's Discretionary Fund
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cumbria
Governance
- 06 November 1969: Standard registration
- 01 August 2011: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114 | £114 | £114 | £0 | £9 | |
|
Total expenditure | £110 | £120 | £110 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 22 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 14 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 01 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 04 January 2009 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 23/07/1866 AND SCHEME OF 28/01/1974
Charitable objects
FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST MICHAEL AND ST JOHN, WORKINGTON.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST MICHAEL AND ST JOHN, WORKINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window