TOWN ESTATE CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 259531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/03/2016 01/03/2017 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 01/03/2020
Total gross income £2.82k £490 £290 £290 £947
Total expenditure £320 £500 £596 £290 £1.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A