LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SHEFFIELD TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 259596
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £236.15k £122.22k £75.68k £70.14k £78.09k
Total expenditure £295.79k £156.43k £79.71k £106.22k £95.70k