TASBURGH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance to persons in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- TASBURGH UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILLIAN GUELDA CASSON | Chair | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Burnett | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev AUSTIN UZOIGWE | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY ROBERT MERCHANT | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ANTHONY READ | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.47k | £9.60k | £9.81k | £11.83k | £12.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.49k | £9.87k | £9.21k | £9.26k | £10.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21/02/1928 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 APR 2023 as amended on 10 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE INCOME OF THE CHARITIES SHALL BE USED OR APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE PARISH OF TASBURGH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY GRANTS, LOANS, DIRECT PAYMENTS FOR FUEL AND OTHER OUTGOINGS OR EXPENSES OR IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS OR SERVICES TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF INDIVIDUAL RESIDENTS IN NEED AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE CIRCUMSTANCES. ANY ANNUAL INCOME NOT SO EXPENDED SHALL BE CARRIED FORWARD AND USED OR APPLIED AS PART OF THE INCOME OF SUCCEEDING YEARS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TASBURGH.
Linked charities
- 04 November 1969 : Standard registration
- 27 April 2023 : Removed
- 27 April 2023 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rookery House
Saxlingham Lane
Tasburgh
Norwich
NR15 1LP
- Phone:
- 01508470668
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window