WEST YORKSHIRE (LEEDS CITY) POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Leeds City
Governance
- 23 January 1970: Standard registration
- 01 August 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE LEEDS CITY POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- WEST YORKSHIRE METROPOLITAN (LEEDS CITY) POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 06 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1 JUNE 1938 AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 1969 AND 17 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR ANY MEMBER FREE OF COST IN THE CASE OF NECESSITY AND SUBJECT TO THE RECOMMENDATION OF A MEDICAL ADVISOR TO THE FUND AND/OR PRIOR APPROVAL ON BEHALF OF THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT. (A) OPERATIVE OR OTHER TREATMENT AT ANY HOSPITAL OR NURSING HOME; (B) ADEQUATE HOME NURSNG FACILITIES; (C) ACCOMMODATION AND TREATMENT AT A COMVALESCENT HOME TOGETHER WITH REASONABLE TRAVELLING EXPENSES (D) IN SPECIAL CASES MEDICAL APPLIANCES.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window