THE PHILLIPS AND RUBENS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees receive applications for donations from a wide variety of charitable institutions including those engaged in medical and ancillary services (including medical research), education, helping the disabled and old aged, relieving poverty, providing sheltered accommodation, developing the arts etc. In the year the trustees made donations of ?233,379 to a wide variety of charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 February 1970: Standard registration
- THE RUTH AND MICHAEL PHILLIPS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY MARK PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLYN LOUISE MISHON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL SIMON PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £476.47k | £426.56k | £494.20k | £506.85k | £436.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £397.96k | £425.28k | £505.85k | £487.32k | £482.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £356.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £150.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £434.29k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £40.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £318.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 16 DECEMBER 1969, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PHILLIPS & RUBENS CHARITABLE TR
67-69 GEORGE STREET
LONDON
W1U 8LT
- Phone:
- 020 7487 5757
- Email:
- psphillips@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window