Financial history EDMUND ARNOLD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 260589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £42.74k £46.84k £54.23k £50.12k £55.71k
Total expenditure £18.50k £9.14k £37.42k £9.83k £40.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A