Trustees EDMUND ARNOLD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 260589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS HUGH ADAMS Chair
None on record
Robert Gifford Trustee 17 November 2021
ARTS & HERITAGE ALLIANCE MILTON KEYNES
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL WEALTH FUND
Recently registered
Karen Elizabeth Cooper Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Charles Kiloh Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Rev Stephen Burrow Trustee 11 May 2017
None on record
Rev Stephen Alexander Kelly Trustee 27 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES, NORTHAMPTON
Received: On time
MICHAEL STANLEY THOMAS ESSERY Trustee 21 January 2013
BLISS'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROSS NORTHING Trustee
WHITNELL COLLENS PARROTT CHARITY
Received: On time
STONY STRATFORD AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
JOHN WHALLEY
Received: On time
ST. MARY AND ST. GILES CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE ST MARY AND ST GILES CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET HOOPER Trustee
NORTHAMPTON PHILHARMONIC CHOIR
Received: On time
JOHN STUART GJERS GLOAG Trustee
THE AFRICA (MATABELELAND) CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOANNA FRANCES DICKSON Trustee
None on record
IAN BRODIE Trustee
None on record