THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 260601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £231.84k £269.62k £278.99k £285.36k £290.79k
Total expenditure £228.10k £240.89k £260.66k £260.67k £302.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A