THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 260601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev CHRISTOPHER DAMP Trustee
CONGREGATIONAL FUND BOARD Received: On time
JOHN GEORGE ELLIS Trustee 05 February 2015
ALLIANCE HOUSE FOUNDATION Received: On time
KENT WORKPLACE MISSION Received: On time
THE CHAPELS SOCIETY Received: On time
WESTMINSTER COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE Received: On time
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
SIMON FAIRNINGTON Trustee 24 September 2015
URC THAMES NORTH TRUST Received: On time
Thomas Brand Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Philip Bonnier Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Rev GWYNNE Martin EVANS Trustee
THE BIBLE PREACHING TRUST Received: On time
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED Received: On time
LONDON SEMINARY Received: On time
CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNAFFILIATED CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES Received: On time
Rev DEREK WALES Trustee 24 January 2008 None on record
Rev BARBARA JEAN BRIDGES MA Trustee 05 February 2015
GLOUCESTERSHIRE CHURCHES TOGETHER Received: On time
CONGREGATIONAL FUND BOARD Received: On time
MARGARET THOMPSON Trustee 23 September 2010
UNITED REFORMED CHURCH TRUST Received: On time
Dr DIGBY JAMES Trustee 09 February 2006 None on record
Susan Margaret Austin Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record