SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 260615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.58k £6.86k £5.32k £5.32k £22.58k
Total expenditure £10.83k £8.03k £8.11k £8.11k £2.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A