FRINTON AND WALTON DISTRICT OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE ASSOCIATION(AGE CONCERN)

Charity number: 260689
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JANUARY 1970 AND AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1981 AND 12TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN THE AREA ADMINISTEREDBY THE FRINTON AND WALTON TOWN COUNCIL THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR MAY HEAFTER BE DEEMED CHARITABLE.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 06 March 1970 : registered
  • 16 August 2010 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • HEWITT HOUSE (Working name)
  • THE FRINTON AND WALTON OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helped
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services