NEWALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 260728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 April 2021 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 22 March 2021 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 14 June 2018 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 14 June 2018 129 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 13 December 2016 On time Download