NEWALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 260728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £53.06k £77.50k £6.46k £3.80k £3.68k
Total expenditure £32.51k £19.83k £21.51k £12.30k £23.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A