THE CHARITABLE AND BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE ROTARY CLUB OF UCKFIELD

Charity number: 260888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 05 May 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 November 2019 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 01 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required