MVM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 260916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required