MVM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 260916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £19.29k £15.63k £21.39k £15.62k £13.82k
Total expenditure £29.92k £28.59k £35.35k £28.82k £30.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A