TEDBURN ST MARY WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 260956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £392 £377 £395 £418 £428
Total expenditure £500 £0 £0 £500 £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A