Financial history LABORATORY ANIMALS LIMITED

Charity number: 261047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £341.17k £301.62k £312.57k £294.36k £216.00k
Total expenditure £307.32k £280.11k £300.47k £219.56k £192.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A