Trustees LABORATORY ANIMALS LIMITED
Charity number: 261047

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JAN BAS PRINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Paulin Jirkof | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Branko Zevnik | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pim Rooymans | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ritchie | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Wells | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Jussi Helppi | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ken Applebee | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marion Berard | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Javier Guillen | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MEREL RITSKES-HOITINGA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr COLIN GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSE MARIA ORELLANA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr BEAT RIEDERER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr LUIS MIGUEL ATUNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELEANOR WEIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MICHAEL WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NATHAN EZOV | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.