THE SAMUEL GARDNER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 261059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £48.16k £45.22k £51.46k £49.38k £53.29k
Total expenditure £67.97k £56.18k £54.41k £56.47k £53.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A