SOUTHERN JERSEY CATTLE CLUB

Charity number: 261064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £737 £525 £84 £1.13k £15
Total expenditure £830 £868 £451 £890 £50
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A