THE CHARLWOOD SOCIETY

Charity number: 261091
Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 April 2021 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 May 2019 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required