THE CHARLWOOD SOCIETY

Charity number: 261091
Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.62k £1.25k £1.89k £193 £1.12k
Total expenditure £1.38k £1.86k £747 £456 £418
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A