NORLAND CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 261166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSEMARY MARILYN BAUCCIO Trustee None on record
Timothy Philip Broke-Smith Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
Ruth Annie Saunders Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
CATRIONA LLOYD Trustee 13 November 2014 None on record
JOHN GEOFFREY SANFORD HODGSON Trustee None on record
Martin Ingell Trustee 16 September 2021 None on record
Andrew Digby Learoyd Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
MRS CHRISSIE COLBECK Trustee 01 July 2012 None on record
Veronica Mary Scott Trustee 01 September 2011 None on record
Vanessa Bartulovic Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Geraldine E Lawrence Trustee 16 September 2021 None on record
MRS GEORGIE LEBUS Trustee None on record